This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2019 at 08:09:10 (UTC).

GREEN v. SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by GREEN against SMITH in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00370

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

STEPHEN HYLES

Presiding Judge

MARC THOMAS TREADWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID KEITH GREEN

Jackson, GA 30233-3877

Defendant

SHERIFF THOMAS SMITH

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Envelope

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DAVID KEITH GREEN (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) Modified on 11/5/2019 to change docket text (vs). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DAVID KEITH GREEN (vs) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) Letter from David Green requesting status of case. ***Mailed copy of Docket Sheet *** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $50.67. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-5-19. (rcg) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

4 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THOMAS SMITH,filed by DAVID KEITH GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $50.67. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-5-19. (rcg) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DAVID KEITH GREEN (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) Modified on 11/5/2019 to change docket text (vs). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from David Green requesting status of case. ***Mailed copy of Docket Sheet *** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DAVID KEITH GREEN (vs) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against THOMAS SMITH,filed by DAVID KEITH GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.