This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:00:06 (UTC).

Green v. Saul

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Green filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Kay Green

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Upton Reynolds, II

Attorney at THOMAS UPTON REYNOLDS, II, ATTORNEY

P. O. Box 280

Charleston, MS 38921-0220

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue process for the defendant named in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/6/20. (ncb)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Saul served on 1/13/2020. (jwr) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to US Marshal for service (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue process for the defendant named in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/6/20. (ncb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephanie Kay Green. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Stephanie Kay Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.