This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:24:15 (UTC).

Green v. McMahon et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by Green against McMahon in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01304

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Alfred V. Covello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curtis Green

Defendants

Brian McMahon

City of Milford

Brien McMahon

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019. Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James Newhall Tallberg on behalf of Brian McMahon, City of Milford (Tallberg, James) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brian McMahon, City of Milford* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David N. Rosen* *David N. Rosen & Associates, P.C.* *400 Orange St* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5409144.), filed by Curtis Green.(Rosen, David) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander T. Taubes on behalf of Curtis Green (Taubes, Alexander) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Green. Brian McMahon served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; City of Milford served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Rosen, David) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #1 Complaint filed by Curtis Green Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Curtis Green.(Rosen, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#10

(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/14/2019 Answer #1 Complaint by Brian McMahon, City of Milford. (Tallberg, James) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curtis Green. (Rosen, David) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint & Caption by Curtis Green.Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Rosen, David) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Curtis Green.(Rosen, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting the plaintiff's #12 motion to amend/correct the complaint and caption. The plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/20/2019. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint & Caption by Curtis Green.Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Rosen, David) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Answer deadline updated for Brian McMahon to 10/14/2019; City of Milford to 10/14/2019. See 11 Order. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting the #10 consent motion for extension of time. The time for the defendants to respond to the complaint is hereby extended to and including October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/16/2019. (Sondergeld, C.) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/14/2019 Answer #1 Complaint by Brian McMahon, City of Milford. (Tallberg, James) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James Newhall Tallberg on behalf of Brian McMahon, City of Milford (Tallberg, James) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curtis Green. (Rosen, David) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander T. Taubes on behalf of Curtis Green (Taubes, Alexander) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Green. Brian McMahon served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; City of Milford served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Rosen, David) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brian McMahon, City of Milford* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David N. Rosen* *David N. Rosen & Associates, P.C.* *400 Orange St* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #1 Complaint filed by Curtis Green Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019. Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rosen, David) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5409144.), filed by Curtis Green.(Rosen, David) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.