This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2022 at 07:28:20 (UTC).

Green v. FCI Lender Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 Green filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FCI Lender Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Green

Defendants

Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC

FCI Lender Services, Inc.

Wells Fargo Bank NA doing business as Wells Fargo Home Mortgage

Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisbeth K Findsen

Attorney at Price Law Group

8245 N 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Sharon K Campbell

Attorney at Law Office of Sharon K Campbell

3500 Oak Lawn Ave, Suite 205

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Jared T S Pace

Attorney at Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC

8080 Park Lane, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75231

Justin David Hanna

Attorney at Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton PLLC

8080 Park Lane, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew Hogan Davis

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Swan Wright

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wright, Katherine) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by FCI Lender Services, Inc., Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pace, Jared) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

14 #11

Exhibit(s)

14 #10

Exhibit(s)

14 #9

Exhibit(s)

14 #8

Exhibit(s)

14 #7

Exhibit(s)

14 #6

Exhibit(s)

14 #5

Exhibit(s)

14 #4

Exhibit(s)

14 #3

Exhibit(s)

14 #2

Exhibit(s)

14 #1

Exhibit(s)

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against FCI Lender Services, Inc., Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wells Fargo Bank NA filed by Richard Green. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s)) (Findsen, Lisbeth) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#13

(#13) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Richard Green. (Findsen, Lisbeth) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sharon K Campbell on behalf of Richard Green. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Campbell, Sharon) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Davis, Matthew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss, Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement, filed by FCI Lender Services, Inc., Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pace, Jared) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wright, Katherine) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by FCI Lender Services, Inc., Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pace, Jared) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against FCI Lender Services, Inc., Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wells Fargo Bank NA filed by Richard Green. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s)) (Findsen, Lisbeth) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Richard Green. (Findsen, Lisbeth) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sharon K Campbell on behalf of Richard Green. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Campbell, Sharon) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Davis, Matthew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss, Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement, filed by FCI Lender Services, Inc., Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pace, Jared) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 ...Before the Court is Defendant Wells Fargos Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Motion (ECF No. #8 ), filed January 27, 2022. Having considered the motion, briefing, and applicable law, the Court GRANTS the motion. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Accordingly, Wells Fargo must file its responsive pleadings on or before February 4, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/31/2022) (wxc) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Matthew) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeadline set: Responses due by 1/30/2022 Per Order #7 (wxc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 ...Before the Court is Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Motion (ECF No. #6 ), filed January 24, 2022. Having considered the motion, briefing, and applicable law, the Court GRANTS in part the motion. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Accordingly, Defendant must file its responsive pleadings on or before January 30, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/25/2022) (wxc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by FCI Lender Services, Inc., Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A (Pace, Jared) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than February 1, 2022. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before February 15, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/18/2022) (bdb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Defendants FCI Lender Service Inc and Residential Credit Opportunities Trust VII-A's Consent to Removal) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant FCI Lender Services, Inc. (Wright, Katherine) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Wright, Katherine) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12527785) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1 - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3 - Civil Information Sheets, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4 - TRO & Return Hearing, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5 - Amended Temporary Restraining Order and Return Hearing, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6 - Residential Credit's Original Answer, #8 Exhibit(s) A-7 - Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit(s) B - Northern District of Texas Civil Information Sheets, #10 Exhibit(s) C - Certificate of Interested Persons, #11 Exhibit(s) D - Tarrant County CAD Report) (Wright, Katherine) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESIDENTIAL CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES TRUST VI-A is a litigant

Latest cases where FCI LENDER SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant