This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:48:39 (UTC).

Green v. Buckner

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Green filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Buckner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard F. Sachs and Prisoner Pro Se. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00572

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard F. Sachs

Referral Judge

Prisoner Pro Se

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shawn Green

Licking, MO 65542

Respondent

Michele Buckner

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and subject to modification by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri; and (2) this petition for a writ of habeas corpus and its attendant motions are transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on July 20, 2020 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shawn Green (Attachment: #1 Petition Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT number KCMO085394 in the amount of $5.00 issued to DOC for Shawn Green. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and subject to modification by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri; and (2) this petition for a writ of habeas corpus and its attendant motions are transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on July 20, 2020 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shawn Green (Attachment: #1 Petition Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less