This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 07:57:05 (UTC).

Green v. Blount County, Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Green filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Blount County, Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Ott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01838

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Ott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Megan C Green

Defendants

Mark Moon

Blount County, Alabama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William M Dawson

Attorney at DAWSON LAW OFFICE

1736 Oxmoor Road, #101, 307-7021

Birmingham, AL 35209

Stephen Keith Woodall

Attorney at WOODALL LAW FIRM

1736 Oxmoor Road, Ste. 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorney

Robert C Lockwood

Attorney at WILMER & LEE PA

100 Washington Street, Suite 200, P O Box 2168

Huntsville, AL 35804

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Keith Woodall on behalf of Megan C Green (Woodall, Stephen) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#14

(#14) INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/9/2020. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Moon, Megan C Green, Blount County, Alabama. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 1/23/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 1/8/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in a directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/13/2019. (BST) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/13/2019. (BST, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Continue Motion is RIPE 12/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Megan C Green. (Dawson, William) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon. (Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megan C Green. Blount County, Alabama served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Mark Moon served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon mailed certified mail (KAM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Megan C Green. (KAM) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon, filed by Megan C Green.(KAM) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Keith Woodall on behalf of Megan C Green (Woodall, Stephen) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/9/2020. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • (#13) ORDER that the telephone conference set for 1/8/20 is cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/7/2020. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Moon, Megan C Green, Blount County, Alabama. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • (#11) NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Wednesday, 1/8/20; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 9:00 AM, 1/8/20, the conference will be cancelled. (BST) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 1/23/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 1/8/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in a directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/13/2019. (BST) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/13/2019. (BST, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines in re #5 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff opposition or other response shall now be due by January 13, 2020; Defendants may reply by January 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/11/2019.(SJB) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Continue Motion is RIPE 12/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Megan C Green. (Dawson, William) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 1/3/2020 Replies due by 1/13/2020. (KAM) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Mark Moon and Blount County, Alabama. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion to dismiss by January 3, 2020. Defendants may reply by January 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/10/2019. (SJB) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon. (Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megan C Green. Blount County, Alabama served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Mark Moon served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon mailed certified mail (KAM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601102027 (KAM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Megan C Green. (KAM) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Blount County, Alabama, Mark Moon, filed by Megan C Green.(KAM) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.