This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2020 at 10:02:22 (UTC).

Green v. Beau Villa Apartments et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Green filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Beau Villa Apartments. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00284

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Green

Defendants

Rockette Miller Individually doing business as Beau Villa Apartments

John Does 1-5

Beau Villa Apartments

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Ashley Ogden

Attorney at OGDEN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

500 East Capitol Street, Suite 3

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan M. Lieb

Attorney at MCDOWELL, KNIGHT, ROEDDER & SLEDGE, LLC

P. O. Box 350 (36601), 11 N. Water Street, Suite 13290

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rockette Miller.(Lieb, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Green. Rockette Miller served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Ogden, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Beau Villa Apartments, Rockette Miller. (JCH) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Beau Villa Apartments, John Does 1-5, Rockette Miller (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643012588), filed by Frank Green (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rockette Miller.(Lieb, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Green. Rockette Miller served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Ogden, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIssued summons #2 mailed to attorney, via SASE provided. (JCH) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Beau Villa Apartments, Rockette Miller. (JCH) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Beau Villa Apartments, John Does 1-5, Rockette Miller (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643012588), filed by Frank Green (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Ashley Ogden