This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 07:22:53 (UTC).

Green v. 3M Company, The et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Green filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03577

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Green

Defendants

3M Company, The

Du Pont De Nemours Inc

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

BASF Corporation

Chemguard Inc

National Foam Inc

EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company

Chemours Company FC LLC, The

Dowdupont Inc

Kidde-Fenwal Inc

UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc

Corteva Inc

Dynax Corporation

Chemours Company, The

AGC Chemicals Americas Inc

Arkema Inc

Carrier Global Corporation

Clariant Corporation

ChemDesign Products Inc

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon M Pennock

Attorney at Pennock Law Firm

411 Lafayette Streetfl 6

New York, NY 10003

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10154580.), filed by Kenneth Green. Service due by 1/27/2022(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

#1987

(#4) STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Green v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3577-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Oregon (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10154580.), filed by Kenneth Green. Service due by 1/27/2022(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carrier Global Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Arkema Inc is a litigant