This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 09:40:35 (UTC).

Green et al v. Old Republic Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Green filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Old Republic Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J Hanna and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amarrah Green

Isaiah Green

Marvin Green

Elizabeth Green

Defendants

Landstar Ranger, Inc.

Marcus Bell

Old Republic Insurance Company

Landstar Ranger Inc

Old Republic Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth Ann Hancock

Attorney at Morris Dewett & Savoie

509 Milam St

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Lynn Braslow

Attorney at Wanek Kirsch Davies

1340 Poydras St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Emma Madison Barton

Attorney at Wanek Kirsch Davies

1340 Poydras St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Kyle P Kirsch

Attorney at Wanek Kirsch Davies

1340 Poydras St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#7

(#7) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(aty,Barton, Emma) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Landstar System Holdings Inc for Landstar Ranger Inc. (aty,Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co.(aty,Barton, Emma) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sara Lynn Braslow on behalf of Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/5/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/19/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

1 #9

Civil cover sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Parish of Lafayette, Case Number 2021-0086 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4577547) filed by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Sara Lynn Braslow added to party Landstar Ranger Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Lynn Braslow added to party Old Republic Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Braslow, Sara) Modified docket text on 2/19/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 02/18/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(aty,Barton, Emma) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Landstar System Holdings Inc for Landstar Ranger Inc. (aty,Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co.(aty,Barton, Emma) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/22/2021. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sara Lynn Braslow on behalf of Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/5/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/19/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Landstar Ranger Inc answer due 2/25/2021; Old Republic Insurance Co answer due 2/25/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified docket text on 2/19/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Parish of Lafayette, Case Number 2021-0086 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4577547) filed by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Sara Lynn Braslow added to party Landstar Ranger Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Lynn Braslow added to party Old Republic Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Braslow, Sara) Modified docket text on 2/19/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDSTAR RANGER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Republic Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Ann Hancock