Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2020 at 09:49:40 (UTC).

Green et al v. Hudson Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Green filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hudson Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth K. Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Dudley Ross Green

Sheryl N. Green

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Hudson Insurance Company

Sarah T. Melton

Defendants and Counter Defendants

Sarah T. Melton

Dudley Ross Green

Sheryl N. Green

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Kyle McNew

Attorney at Michie Hamlett PLLC

500 Court Square, Suite 300

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Michael Bryan Slaughter

Attorney at Michie, Hamlett, Lowry, Rasmussen & Tweel, P.C.

500 Court Square, Suite 300

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Karen Lynn Toto

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-2304

Joseph William Gross

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-2304

David H. Topol

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-2304

Andrew Major Hanson

Attorney at PENN STUART & ESKRIDGE

804 Anderson Street

Bristol, TN 37620

John Peter Cattano

Attorney at Central Virginia Litigation, PLC

One Boar'S Head Lane

Charlottesville, VA 22903

Christopher Lee Smith

Attorney at Central Virginia Litigation, PLC

One Boar'S Head Lane

Charlottesville, VA 22903

Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Major Hanson

Attorney at PENN STUART & ESKRIDGE

804 Anderson Street

Bristol, TN 37620

John Peter Cattano

Attorney at Central Virginia Litigation, PLC

One Boar'S Head Lane

Charlottesville, VA 22903

Christopher Lee Smith

Attorney at Central Virginia Litigation, PLC

One Boar'S Head Lane

Charlottesville, VA 22903

Edward Kyle McNew

Attorney at Michie Hamlett PLLC

500 Court Square, Suite 300

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Michael Bryan Slaughter

Attorney at Michie, Hamlett, Lowry, Rasmussen & Tweel, P.C.

500 Court Square, Suite 300

Charlottesville, VA 22902

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) AMENDED ANSWER to by Sarah T. Melton. (Cattano, John)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Remand by Sarah T. Melton. (Cattano, John)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Sarah T. Melton.(Cattano, John)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Further Response to Order for Briefing on Notice of Removal (Doc. 9). filed by Dudley Ross Green, Sheryl N. Green. (McNew, Edward)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Toto, Karen)

#11

(#12) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Order for Briefing on Notice of Removal (Doc. 9). filed by Dudley Ross Green, Sheryl N. Green. (McNew, Edward)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#10) Oral ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney David H. Topol added; granting #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Joseph W. Gross added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/31/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)

#6

(#6) Scheduling Letter (bwd)

5 #4

Exhibit D

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hudson Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Odyssey Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Odyssey Holdings Group, Inc. for Hudson Insurance Company. (Toto, Karen)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Hudson Insurance Company's Brief In Support of Removal

#1

(#9) Order For Briefing on #1 Notice of Removal; parties to this litigation, either together or separately, shall file a brief addressing the arguments in Hudson's notice of removal and accompanying brief within fourteen days of the date of this order, or, if a party has not yet been served with the lawsuit, that party shall respond within fourteen days of the date of service of the lawsuit. Hudson may file a further reply in support of its position within seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/31/2020. (jv)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED ANSWER to by Sarah T. Melton. (Cattano, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Remand by Sarah T. Melton. (Cattano, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Sarah T. Melton.(Cattano, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Further Response to Order for Briefing on Notice of Removal (Doc. 9). filed by Dudley Ross Green, Sheryl N. Green. (McNew, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Toto, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dudley Ross Green, Sheryl N. Green.(McNew, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Order for Briefing on Notice of Removal (Doc. 9). filed by Dudley Ross Green, Sheryl N. Green. (McNew, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Oral ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney David H. Topol added; granting #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Joseph W. Gross added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/31/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order For Briefing on #1 Notice of Removal; parties to this litigation, either together or separately, shall file a brief addressing the arguments in Hudson's notice of removal and accompanying brief within fourteen days of the date of this order, or, if a party has not yet been served with the lawsuit, that party shall respond within fourteen days of the date of service of the lawsuit. Hudson may file a further reply in support of its position within seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/31/2020. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Joseph W. Gross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3474444. by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toto, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for David H. Topol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3474441. by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toto, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Scheduling Letter (bwd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Dudley Ross Green, Sheryl N. Green, Sarah T. Melton by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Toto, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hudson Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Odyssey Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Odyssey Holdings Group, Inc. for Hudson Insurance Company. (Toto, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing Requirement to Hudson Insurance Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (dg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from August County Circuit Court, case number CL20001754-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3466511), filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Hudson Insurance Company's Brief In Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Bryan Slaughter