This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:28:42 (UTC).

Green et al v. Chicago Title Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 Green filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chicago Title Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vivian Diane Grote

Michael K. Green

W. Scott Green

Billings, MT 59101

Bradley A. Green

Defendants

Thomas Zengel

Fidelity National Title Group

Chicago Title Insurance Company

Chicago Title Insurance Company of Idaho

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Scott Green

Attorney at PATTEN PETERMAN BEKKEDAHL & GREEN

2817 Second Ave North, Suite 300

Billings, MT 59101

Michael F. McGuinness

Attorney at PATTEN PETERMAN BEKKEDAHL & GREEN, PLLC

2817 Second Ave North, Suite 300

Billings, MT 59101

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory G. Schultz

Attorney at Law Offices of Gregory Schultz, P.C.

210 East Pine Street, Suite 200

Missoula, MT 59802

Whitney M. Kolivas

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Thomas Zengel. (Kolivas, Whitney) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#14

(#14) ERRATA #13 Preliminary Pretrial Statement, correct main document attachment. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

13 #15

Appendix

13 #14

Appendix

13 #13

Appendix

13 #12

Appendix

13 #11

Appendix

13 #10

Appendix

13 #9

Appendix

13 #8

Appendix

13 #7

Appendix

13 #6

Appendix

13 #5

Appendix

13 #4

Appendix

13 #3

Appendix

13 #2

Appendix

13 #1

Appendix

#13

(#13) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Bradley A. Green. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix) (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Thomas Zengel. (Kolivas, Whitney) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ERRATA #13 Preliminary Pretrial Statement, correct main document attachment. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Bradley A. Green. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix) (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Bradley A. Green. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Bradley A. Green. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER WITHHOLDING CONSENT. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/29/2020. (JDR) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/26/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/26/2020. (JDR) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDERED: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), a telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference shall be held on June 2, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel must follow these steps to use the Courts conferencing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/15/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice: re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Name of attorney whose NEF was undeliverable: Gregory G. Schultz. (MRC) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice: re #6 Answer to Complaint. Name of attorney whose NEF was undeliverable: Gregory G. Schultz. (MRC) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendants' ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Thomas Zengel. (Kolivas, Whitney) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG Holdings, LLC for Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group.. (Kolivas, Whitney) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants, filed by Vivian Diane Grote, Bradley A. Green, Michael K. Green(Personal Representative of the Estate of William S. Green), Michael K. Green(individually), W. Scott Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (JDR) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2020-0000293-BF, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Cavan as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Gregory G. Schultz, Whitney M. Kolivas, Michael F. McGuinness, W. Scott Green. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/17/2020. (APP) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2462669. (EMH) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants from Montana Thirteenth Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County, cause number DV-20-0293. #1 Exhibit A. State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Summons, #3 Exhibit C. Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH). (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney M. Kolivas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory G. Schultz