This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2022 at 08:04:28 (UTC).

GREEN et al v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 GREEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMAZON COM, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00496

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMBER GREEN

ERIC GREEN

Defendants

HANDVOLL

AMAZON.COM, INC.

AMAZON ENTERPRISES, INC

AMAZON HOME, INC

AMAZON, LLC

AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC

AMAZON RETAIL, LLC

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC

AMAZON.COM, LLC

AMAZON.COM SALES, INC.

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC

HANDVOL

JOHN DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Athena Marie Dufour-Mason

Attorney at Meyer Darragh Buckler Bebenek & Eck, PLLC

600 Grant Street, Suite 4850

Pittsburgh, PA 12519

Paul R. Robinson

Attorney at Meyer, Darragh, Buckler, Bebenek & Eck

600 Grant Street

Us Steel Tower, SU 4850

Defendant Attorney

Erin W Grewe

Attorney at Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, P.C.

1205 Westlakes Drive, Suite 330

Berwyn, PA 19312

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-22-002436 with Jury Demand Copies attached: Complaint, Notice to Defend, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Service of Process, Docket Report (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7020396), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON HOME, INC, AMAZON.COM, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON ENTERPRISES, INC, AMAZON RETAIL, LLC, AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC, AMAZON, LLC, AMAZON.COM SALES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, AMAZON RETAIL, LLC, AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM SALES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC. (Grewe, Erin) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, AMAZON RETAIL, LLC, AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM SALES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC. (Grewe, Erin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grewe, Erin) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grewe, Erin) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, AMAZON RETAIL, LLC, AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM SALES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC. (Grewe, Erin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, AMAZON RETAIL, LLC, AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM SALES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC. (Grewe, Erin) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 4/1/2022. (lar) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-22-002436 with Jury Demand Copies attached: Complaint, Notice to Defend, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Service of Process, Docket Report (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7020396), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON HOME, INC, AMAZON.COM, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON ENTERPRISES, INC, AMAZON RETAIL, LLC, AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC, AMAZON, LLC, AMAZON.COM SALES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Retail, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.com Sales, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Web Services Inc is a litigant