This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2021 at 09:54:28 (UTC).

Green et al v. William J. Allen, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Green filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against William J Allen, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00440

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian D Green

Indian Trail, NC 28079

Kim C. Green

Indian Trail, NC 28079

Defendants

William J. Allen

Matthews, NC 28105

William J. Allen, P.A.

Allen Law Firm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

William John Allen

Attorney at William Allen, P.A.

2435 Plantation Center Drive, Suite 205

Matthews, NC 28105

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

#8

#9

#10

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Deadline for service of process is extended sixty days. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/18/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process by Brian D Green, Kim C. Green. (js). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Brian D Green, Kim C. Green. Replies due by 10/22/2021 (js) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued Conventionally as to Allen Law Firm. (js) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against William J. Allen, Allen Law Firm, filed by Brian D Green, Kim C. Green.(js) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by William J. Allen, William J. Allen, P.A.. Responses due by 10/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Allen, William) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Pro Se Complaint. William J. Allen answer due 10/4/2021; William J. Allen, P.A. answer due 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/13/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by William J. Allen and William J. Allen, P.A. Motion referred to David S. Cayer. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (maf) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed. William J. Allen, P.A. served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (tlj) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed. William J. Allen served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (tlj) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (js) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The order was served conventionally. (js) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number CHD067087), filed by Brian D Green, Kim C. Green. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(js) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less