This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 15:04:26 (UTC).

Green Enterprises, LLC v. Dual Corporate Risks Limited et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Green Enterprises, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Dual Corporate Risks Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01243

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Enterprises, LLC

Defendants

Dual Corporate Risks Limited

Hiscox Syndicates Limited at Lloyds of London

Canopius Lloyds Syndicate 4444

Blenheim Lloyds Syndicate 5886

XL Catlin Lloyds Syndicate 2003

Brit Lloyds Syndicate 2987/2988

Amlin Lloyds Syndicate 2001

NOA Lloyds Syndicate 3902

Interested Party

Oriental Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes

Attorney at Andreu & Sagardia Law Office

261 Ave. Domenech

San Juan, PR 00918

Defendant Attorney

Fernando Sabater-Clavell

Attorney at Saldana & Carvajal, P.S.C.

166 Constitucion Ave.

San Juan, PR 00901

Interested Party Attorney

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A (Complaint & Notices)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B (Policy)

1 #5

Exhibit Letter

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/30/2020. (ERC) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition filed by Green Enterprises, LLC filed by Green Enterprises, LLC. (Andreu-Fuentes, Jose) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-Reply filed by Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Andreu-Fuentes, Jose) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Replies in Support of Underwriters Notice of Removal, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss filed by Amlin Lloyds Syndicate 2001, Blenheim Lloyds Syndicate 5886, Brit Lloyds Syndicate 2987/2988, Canopius Lloyds Syndicate 4444, Hiscox Syndicates Limited at Lloyds of London, NOA Lloyds Syndicate 3902, XL Catlin Lloyds Syndicate 2003 Re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Green Enterprises, LLC filed by Amlin Lloyds Syndicate 2001, Blenheim Lloyds Syndicate 5886, Brit Lloyds Syndicate 2987/2988, Canopius Lloyds Syndicate 4444, Hiscox Syndicates Limited at Lloyds of London, NOA Lloyds Syndicate 3902, XL Catlin Lloyds Syndicate 2003. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Document Underwriters Reply in Support of their Notice of Removal, Motion to Compel Arbitration, and Motion to Dismiss, and Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Amlin Lloyds Syndicate 2001, Blenheim Lloyds Syndicate 5886, Brit Lloyds Syndicate 2987/2988, Canopius Lloyds Syndicate 4444, Hiscox Syndicates Limited at Lloyds of London, NOA Lloyds Syndicate 3902, XL Catlin Lloyds Syndicate 2003 Responses due by 6/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Andreu-Fuentes, Jose) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Andreu-Fuentes, Jose) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Oriental Bank (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to dismiss Count I of the Complaint as to Green Enterprises, LLC filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Canopius Lloyds Syndicate 4444, Hiscox Syndicates Limited at Lloyds of London, NOA Lloyds Syndicate 3902, Brit Lloyds Syndicate 2987/2988, Blenheim Lloyds Syndicate 5886, XL Catlin Lloyds Syndicate 2003, Amlin Lloyds Syndicate 2001 Responses due by 6/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Amlin Lloyds Syndicate 2001, Blenheim Lloyds Syndicate 5886, Brit Lloyds Syndicate 2987/2988, Canopius Lloyds Syndicate 4444, Hiscox Syndicates Limited at Lloyds of London, NOA Lloyds Syndicate 3902, XL Catlin Lloyds Syndicate 2003 Responses due by 6/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mayaguez First Instance Court, case number MZ2020CV00371. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6896356), filed by Canopius Lloyds Syndicate 4444, Hiscox Syndicates Limited at Lloyds of London, NOA Lloyds Syndicate 3902, Brit Lloyds Syndicate 2987/2988, Blenheim Lloyds Syndicate 5886, XL Catlin Lloyds Syndicate 2003, Amlin Lloyds Syndicate 2001. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A (Complaint & Notices), #4 Exhibit Exhibit B (Policy), #5 Exhibit Letter)(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez