This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2020 at 08:39:37 (UTC).

Gree, Inc. v. Supercell Oy et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Gree, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Supercell Oy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-01041

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Gree, Inc.

Petitioner

Andrew Sheppard

Counter Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Claimant and Respondent

Supercell Oy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Counter Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Harry Lee Gillam, Jr

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Counter Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Claimant and Respondent Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Michael J Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street - 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#3

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

1 #12

Proposed Order

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt

1 #10

Exhibit H

1 #9

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Declaration of Andrew Sheppard

1 #1

Declaration of Kasey E. Koballa

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Eastern District of Texas as case number 2:20-mc-00013. (jv2) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #1 MOTION to Quash and Motion to Transfer. (jv2) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re #1 Non-Party Andrew Sheppard's MOTION to Quash and Accompanying MOTION to Transfer. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Transfer is GRANTED and Non-Party Andrew Sheppard's Motion to Quash is HEREBY TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Marshall Division. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (jv2) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Supercell Oy, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Andrew Sheppard [Defendant Supercell Oy's Response to Non-Party Andrew Sheppard's Motion to Quash and Accompanying Motion to Transfer] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: referred #1 MOTION to Quash. Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (jv2) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #1 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Andrew Sheppard's motion to quash, (Dkt. 1), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Quash ($47.00 Filing Fee #100039189) by Andrew Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kasey E. Koballa, #2 Declaration of Andrew Sheppard, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt, #12 Proposed Order)(cj) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harry Lee Gillam, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith