This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/28/2019 at 07:43:39 (UTC).

GREE, INC v. SUPERCELL OY

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 GREE, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SUPERCELL OY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREE, INC

Defendant

SUPERCELL OY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven David Moore

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Scott Edward Kolassa

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Menlo Park

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

William Edward Mosley

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Menlo Park

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

Defendant Attorney

Geoffrey Robert Miller

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Mountain View

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY.( Miller, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREE, INC. SUPERCELL OY served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst on behalf of GREE, INC (Pfingst, Taylor) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Edward Mosley on behalf of GREE, INC (Mosley, William) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Edward Kolassa on behalf of GREE, INC (Kolassa, Scott) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of GREE, INC (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to SUPERCELL OY. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GREE, INC (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SUPERCELL OY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7159178.), filed by GREE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Steven) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SUPERCELL OY to 5/16/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY.( Miller, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREE, INC. SUPERCELL OY served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/20/2019. (klc, ) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst on behalf of GREE, INC (Pfingst, Taylor) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Edward Mosley on behalf of GREE, INC (Mosley, William) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Edward Kolassa on behalf of GREE, INC (Kolassa, Scott) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of GREE, INC (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to SUPERCELL OY. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GREE, INC (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SUPERCELL OY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7159178.), filed by GREE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Steven) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey Robert Miller