This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2020 at 10:54:15 (UTC).

GREE, INC. v. SUPERCELL OY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 GREE, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SUPERCELL OY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREE, INC.

Defendant

SUPERCELL OY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Rishi Gupta

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP - San Francisco

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Franciso, CA 94111

Andrew W Rinehart

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Michael T Morlock

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Steven David Moore

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

Norris Power Boothe

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Menlo Park

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

John C Alemanni

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Alton Absher, III

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Taylor Higgins Ludlam

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Raleigh

4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

Kasey E. Koballa

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - DC

607 14Th St Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Geoffrey Robert Miller

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - New York

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010

Christopher L. Larson

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jessica Andrea Martinez Kaempf

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Seattle

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Jonathan Thomas McMichael

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Seattle

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Michael J Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Shannon Elizabeth Turner

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Bryan Alexander Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/17/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher L. Larson on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Larson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Elizabeth Turner on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Turner, Shannon) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Andrea Martinez Kaempf on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Kaempf, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Thomas McMichael on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (McMichael, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Robert Miller on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Miller, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SUPERCELL OY to 6/26/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alton Absher, III on behalf of GREE, INC. (Absher, Alton) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Norris Power Boothe on behalf of GREE, INC. (Boothe, Norris) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SUPERCELL OY to 6/11/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to SUPERCELL OY. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREE, INC.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GREE, INC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SUPERCELL OY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7759097.), filed by GREE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rishi Gupta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW WILLIAM RINEHART

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norris Power Boothe