This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2019 at 08:05:03 (UTC).

GREE, INC. v. SUPERCELL OY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 GREE, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SUPERCELL OY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00311

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREE, INC.

Defendant

SUPERCELL OY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Steven David Moore

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

Norris Power Boothe

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Menlo Park

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

John C Alemanni

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Taylor Higgins Ludlam

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Raleigh

4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Andrea Martinez Kaempf

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Seattle

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Michael J Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Bryan Alexander Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Geoffrey Robert Miller

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - New York

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SUPERCELL OY identifying Corporate Parent Tencent Holdings Ltd. for SUPERCELL OY. (Kaempf, Jessica) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SUPERCELL OY.(Kaempf, Jessica) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Andrea Martinez Kaempf on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Kaempf, Jessica) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SUPERCELL OY to 11/11/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Robert Miller on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Miller, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY.( Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst on behalf of GREE, INC. (Pfingst, Taylor) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Higgins Ludlam on behalf of GREE, INC. (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Alemanni on behalf of GREE, INC. (Alemanni, John) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven David Moore on behalf of GREE, INC. (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to SUPERCELL OY. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREE, INC.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GREE, INC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SUPERCELL OY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7438584.), filed by GREE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norris Power Boothe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor Higgins Ludlam