This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2022 at 06:24:35 (UTC).

Grecia Estate Holdings LLC v. Facebook, Inc.

Case Summary

On June 28, 2021, Plaintiff Grecia Estate Holdings LLC (“Grecia” or “Plaintiff”) represented by H. Artoush Ohanian and Matthew M. Wawrzyn of WAWRZYN LLC, filed an intellectual property - patent lawsuit for alleged patent infringement against Facebook Inc. (“Facebook” or “Defendant”). This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged “On March 19, 2013, United States Patent No. 8,402,555 was duly and legally issued by the United States Patent and Trademark Office. The ’555 Patent is titled “Personalized digital media access system (PDMAS). Grecia Estate Holdings LLC is the owner of ’555 Patent and has all right, title and interest in the ’555 patent, including all rights to enforce and prosecute actions for infringement and to collect damages for all relevant times against infringers of the ’555 Patent. Accordingly, Grecia possesses the exclusive right and standing to prosecute the present action for infringement of the ’555 Patent by Defendant.

The Plaintiff also alleged “At the time the ’555 patent was filed, there existed various problems in traditional Digital Rights Management (DRM) systems. Previous systems and methods suffered from a few notable shortcomings. For example, in previous systems, in some cases content can terminate access after a set amount of time, or the process can break if the provider of the DRM server ever ceases to offer services. (Ex. A at 1:51-53.) The inventions disclosed in the ’555 patent addressed such problems and discloses the world’s first “Access Management System” which in 2010 were not well-understood, routine, or conventional.”

The Plaintiff further alleged “Defendant makes, uses, offers for sale and sells in the U.S. and to 2.8 billion active users globally, products, systems, and/or services that infringe the Patent-in-Suit, including, but not limited to its Messenger app and Facebook Pay (collectively, the “Accused Product” or “Accused Instrumentality”).”

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first is for alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,402,555. The second claim is for alleged direct infringement of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a).

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requests the Court to order judgment that Facebook Inc. has directly infringed Claim 16 of the ’555 patent; award a reasonable royalty; award pre-judgment interest and post-judgment interest at the maximum rate allowed by law; award injunctive relief, including a preliminary injunction; and award such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00677

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grecia Estate Holdings LLC

Defendant

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew M. Wawrzyn

Henry Artoush Ohanian

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah E. Piepmeier

Jassiem N. Moore

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER GRANTING #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jassiem N. Moore for Meta Platforms, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#46

(#46) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#45

(#45) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#43

(#43) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah E. Piepmeier for Jassiem Moore ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16095804) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

8 #13

Request for the Court to Take Judicial Notice of Certain Documents

8 #12

Exhibit K

8 #11

Exhibit J

8 #8

Exhibit G

8 #1

Declaration of Sarah E. Piepmeier

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B - Claim Chart

1 #2

Exhibit A - US Pat. No. 8,402,555

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

74 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER GRANTING #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jassiem N. Moore for Meta Platforms, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2022. MOTIONS #39 , 56 , 57 , and #16 TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING and will include the postponement of the Markman Hearing. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(sm3) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah E. Piepmeier for Jassiem Moore ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16095804) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER Resetting Motions Hearing by Zoom for 6/3/2022 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by Grecia Estate Holdings LLC. (Ohanian, Henry) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER, (Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2022 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California or, in the Alternative, to the Austin Division filed by Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Grecia Estate Holdings LLC, re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California or, in the Alternative, to the Austin Division filed by Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ohanian, Henry) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The deadline for Defendant Facebook, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond is extended until and including Tuesday, September 7, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 08/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piepmeier, Sarah) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah E. Piepmeier on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. Attorney Sarah E. Piepmeier added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft) (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ohanian, Henry) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/28/2021) (lad). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grecia Estate Holdings LLC. (Ohanian, Henry) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/28/2021) (lad). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14959507), filed by Grecia Estate Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - US Pat. No. 8,402,555, #3 Exhibit B - Claim Chart)(Ohanian, Henry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/28/2021) (lad). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less