This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2021 at 07:29:47 (UTC).

Grecco et al v. Age Fotostock America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2021 Grecco filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Age Fotostock America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00423

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Grecco

Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.

Defendant

Age Fotostock America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Patrick McCulloch

Attorney at The McCulloch Law Firm, PLLC

501 5Th Avenue Suite 1809

New York, NY 10017

Nathaniel Kleinman

Attorney at The McCulloch Law Firm PLLC

501 5Th Avenue Suite 1809

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Marie Gates

Attorney at Cowan, DeBaets, Abrahams & Sheppard LLP

41 Madison Avenue, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

Nancy Evelyn Wolff

Attorney at Cowan, DeBaets, Abrahams & Sheppard LLP

41 Madison Avenue, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(McCulloch, Kevin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#13

(#13) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Motion to Dismiss: Moving papers due 3/4/2021. Answering Papers due 3/18/2021. Replies due 3/25/2021. Oral Argument set for 4/2/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 7/15/2021. The case is to be tried to a jury. Joinder of Parties due by 3/12/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021. Deposition due by 5/12/2021. Discovery due by 6/15/2021. Motions due by 6/22/2021. Responses due by 7/6/2021. Replies due by 7/13/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/18/2021) (va) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Marie Gates on behalf of Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Gates, Sara) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Evelyn Wolff on behalf of Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 2-19-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/5/2021) (va) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick McCulloch on behalf of Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(McCulloch, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#5

(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Age Fotostock America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Copyright Registration Certificates

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Screen Captures

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Photographs

#1

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Age Fotostock America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Nathaniel Kleinman in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Visual Content License Agreement).(McCulloch, Kevin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(McCulloch, Kevin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Nancy E. Wolff in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Age Fotostock America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Motion to Dismiss: Moving papers due 3/4/2021. Answering Papers due 3/18/2021. Replies due 3/25/2021. Oral Argument set for 4/2/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 7/15/2021. The case is to be tried to a jury. Joinder of Parties due by 3/12/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021. Deposition due by 5/12/2021. Discovery due by 6/15/2021. Motions due by 6/22/2021. Responses due by 7/6/2021. Replies due by 7/13/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/18/2021) (va) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/19/2021. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Marie Gates on behalf of Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Gates, Sara) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Evelyn Wolff on behalf of Age Fotostock America, Inc...(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 2-19-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/5/2021) (va) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Age Fotostock America, Inc...(dnh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick McCulloch on behalf of Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(McCulloch, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Age Fotostock America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Age Fotostock America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23561260)Document filed by Michael Grecco, Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Photographs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Screen Captures, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copyright Registration Certificates).(Kleinman, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara Marie Gates