This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 10:22:37 (UTC).

GreatGigz Solutions, LLC v. ZipRecruiter, Inc.

Case Summary

On February 25, 2021, GreatGigz Solutions, LLC (“Plaintiff”) represented by Christopher A. Honea, M. Scott Fuller, Randall T. Garteiser, Rene A. Vazquez and Thomas G. Fasone, III of Garteiser Honea, PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against ZipRecruiter, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking damages, royalties and costs for allegedly infringing one or more claims of four Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the  Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of more than one claim of U.S. Patent Nos. 6.662,194 (“the ’194 Patent”); 7,490,086 (“the ’086 Patent”) (hereinafter collectively referred to as “the Asserted Patents”), owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “the claims of the Asserted Patents claim priority to at least July 31, 1999. At that time, the idea of launching ZipRecruiter.com was still several years away” and that “the claims of the Asserted Patents are not drawn to laws of nature, natural phenomena, or abstract ideas. Although the systems and methods claimed in the Asserted Patents are ubiquitous now (and, as a result, are widely infringed), the specific combinations of elements, as recited in the claims, was not conventional or routine at the time of the invention.. Consequently, the claims of the Asserted Patents recite systems and methods resulting in improved functionality of the claimed systems and represent technological improvements to the operation of computers.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “upon information and belief, Defendant provides a web platform (e.g., www.ziprecruiter.com) hosted on Defendant’s server comprising infrastructure including, but not limited to, memory, processors, transmitters and/or receivers that provides an online employment service/portal which connects employers and job seekers and provides job opportunities to the job seekers (“Accused Instrumentalities”). To find jobs, candidates fill in the job title and the preferred geographic location (zip code) of the job.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the asserted patents. In furtherance of the two claims laid down by the Plaintiff, it was further alleged that to the extent Defendant continues, and has continued, its infringing activities noted above in an infringing manner post-notice of the Asserted Patents, such infringement is necessarily willful and deliberate. Plaintiff believes and contends that Defendant’s continuance of its clear and inexcusable infringement of the ’Asserted Patents post-notice is willful, wanton, malicious, bad-faith, deliberate, and/or consciously wrongful and that the Defendant’s alleged activities have been without authority and/or license from Plaintiff.



In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the court to pass an order for declaring that Defendant has infringed each of the Asserted Patents and to award damages suffered because of Defendant’s alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents and award enhanced damages, including treble damages, pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284.in addition to ongoing post-trial royalties; and cost of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GreatGigz Solutions, LLC

Defendant

ZipRecruiter, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M. Scott Fuller

Attorney at Garteiser Honea

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75702

Randall T. Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St

Tyler, TX 75702

Christopher A. Honea

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St.

Tyler, TX 75702

Thomas G. Fasone, III

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75207

Rene A. Vazquez

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

I L9 W. Ferguson Street

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorney

Michael J Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street - 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

7 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ZipRecruiter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including April 22, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ZipRecruiter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. ZipRecruiter, Inc. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Fuller, M.) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ZipRecruiter, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (am) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14526541), filed by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZipRecruiter Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where GreatGigz Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Sacksteder