This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2020 at 16:44:16 (UTC).

GreatGigz Solutions, LLC v. GrubHub Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 GreatGigz Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GrubHub Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00628

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GreatGigz Solutions, LLC

Defendant

GrubHub Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas G. Fasone, III

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75207

Randall T. Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St

Tyler, TX 75702

M. Scott Fuller

Attorney at Garteiser Honea

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75702

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Robert C. Scheinfeld

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Eric J. Faragi

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Syed K. Fareed

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

98 San Jacinto, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

Bailey Morgan Watkins

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1500 San Jacinto Blvd

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit US10096000

1 #4

Exhibit US9760864

1 #3

Exhibit US7490086

1 #2

Exhibit US6662194

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: GrubHub Holdings, Inc. answer due 9/24/2020. (lad) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 24, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by GrubHub Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall T. Garteiser on behalf of GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. Attorney Randall T. Garteiser added to party GreatGigz Solutions, LLC(pty:pla) (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Syed K. Fareed of Robert C. Scheinfeld ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13843020) by on behalf of GrubHub Holdings, Inc.. (Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Syed K. Fareed of Eric J. Faragi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13842529) by on behalf of GrubHub Holdings, Inc.. (Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Syed K. Fareed of Bailey Morgan Watkins ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13841790) by on behalf of GrubHub Holdings, Inc.. (Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed K. Fareed on behalf of GrubHub Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Syed K. Fareed added to party GrubHub Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to GrubHub Holdings, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Randall Garteiser, Rene A. Vazquez and Christopher Honea. (lad) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13749848), filed by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit US6662194, #3 Exhibit US7490086, #4 Exhibit US9760864, #5 Exhibit US10096000)(Fasone, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GreatGigz Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas G Fasone, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall Garteiser