This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 09:23:18 (UTC).

GreatGigz Solutions, LLC v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Case Summary

On August 4, 2021, GreatGigz Solutions, LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Rene A. Vazquez of Garteiser Honea, PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation (“Costco” or “Defendant”), seeking damages and declaratory relief along with ongoing post-trial royalties among other relief for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Western District of Texas. 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 6.662,194 (“the ’194 Patent”), United States Patent No. 7,490,086 (“the ’086 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,760,864 (“the ’864 Patent”) and United States Patent No. 10,096,000 (“the ’000 Patent”) (collectively, “the GGS Patents” or “Asserted Patents” or “Patents-in-suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint, the Plaintiff  alleged that, “On information and belief, Defendant makes, sells, advertises, offers for sale, uses, or otherwise provides the Costco website (www.costco.com) and its ancillary sites, including the CostcoGrocery website (https://www.costco.com/my-life-costco-grocery-online-delivery.html) and various Mobile Applications, in the United States where customers can order groceries and other items online. Costco utilizes Instacart, via the Costco website and via Instacart’s website and Instacart’s ancillary sites (including Instacart’s various Mobile Applications) for same-day delivery of groceries and other items purchased by Costco customers.”

The Plaintiff then alleged that, “The Instacart apparatus comprises servers, hardware, software, and a collection of related and/or linked web pages and mobile applications for providing job search and/or recruitment services to individuals (including job seekers, contractors, and employers) in the United States. The Instacart system comprises an apparatus with multiple interconnected infrastructures that infringe the Asserted Patents” and “Collectively, all of the foregoing comprises the ‘Accused Instrumentalities’.”

Further the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has been on actual notice of the ’194 Patent at least as early as the date it received service of this Original Complaint” and “On information and belief, Defendant owns and controls the operation of the Accused Instrumentalities and generates substantial financial revenues therefrom.” The Plaintiff also alleged that, “On information and belief, Defendant has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe at least Claim 25 of the ’194 Patent by making, using, importing, selling, and/or, offering for sale the Accused Instrumentalities.”

Similar allegations have been made by the Plaintiff with reference to the infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

There are four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to declare that Defendant has infringed each of the Asserted Patents; Awarding GreatGigz Solutions, LLC its damages suffered because of Defendant’s infringement of the Asserted Patents; Awarding GreatGigz Solutions, LLC its costs, attorneys’ fees, expenses, and interest; Awarding GreatGigz Solutions, LLC ongoing post-trial royalties; and any other relief the court finds appropriate. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00807

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GreatGigz Solutions, LLC

Defendant

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rene A. Vazquez

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson Street

Tyler, TX 75702

M. Scott Fuller

Attorney at Garteiser Honea

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75702

Randall T. Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 50000

Dallas, TX 75201

Adil Anjum Shaikh

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suit 5000

Dallas, TX 75202

Lance E. Wyatt, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Ricardo Joel Bonilla

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Costco Wholesale Corporation answer due 10/29/2021. (lad) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) Extended on 8/31/2021 (lad). (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corporation. (ir) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15083292), filed by GreatGigz Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vazquez, Rene) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less