This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2021 at 08:19:09 (UTC).

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Superior Building Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 Greater St Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Superior Building Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John M. Bodenhausen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John M. Bodenhausen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

AFL-CIO

Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

St. Louis Vacation Fund

Local Unions 42-110

Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Laborers International Union of North America

Defendant

Superior Building Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emily R. Perez

Attorney at HAMMOND AND SHINNERS PC

13205 Manchester Rd., Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

9 #1

Alias Summons

#9

(#9) NOTICE Memorandum for Clerk requeting Alias Summons: by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons)(Perez, Emily) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order for Extension of Time

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: alias summons ;Proposed extension date July 27, 2021 by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Perez, Emily) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall, not later than May 27, 2021, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment against defendant Superior Building Group, LLC, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of plaintiffs claims against Superior Building Group, LLC, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 5/6/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Perez, Emily) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Perez, Emily) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8574309, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Unions 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Perez, Emily) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Unions 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. All Defendants. (Perez, Emily) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAlias Summons Issued as to defendant Superior Building Group, LLC. The summons was emailed to Cindy Stegmeyer. (KEK) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the May 6, 2021, order directing plaintiffs to file motions for entry of default and for default judgment no later than May 27, 2021 #7 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file motions for entry of default and for default judgment #8 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 05/20/2021. (LXC) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE Memorandum for Clerk requeting Alias Summons: by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons)(Perez, Emily) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: alias summons ;Proposed extension date July 27, 2021 by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Perez, Emily) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall, not later than May 27, 2021, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment against defendant Superior Building Group, LLC, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of plaintiffs claims against Superior Building Group, LLC, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 5/6/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Unions 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. All Defendants. (Perez, Emily) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 4/18/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Perez, Emily) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Emily R. Perez. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (BAK) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Perez, Emily) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8574309, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Unions 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Perez, Emily) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where Local Union No. 741 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade is a litigant