This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2021 at 08:34:36 (UTC).

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. STF, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Greater St Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against STF, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00571

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

AFL-CIO

Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

St. Louis Vacation Fund

Local Unions Nos. 42-110,

Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis

Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Laborers International Union of North America

Defendant

STF, LLC doing business as Traffic Control

Counter Claimant

STF, LLC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Greg A. Campbell

Attorney at HAMMOND AND SHINNERS PC

13205 Manchester Rd., Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Bryan M. Kaemmerer

Attorney at MCCARTHY AND LEONARD LC

825 Maryville Centre Dr., Suite 300

Town And Country, MO 63017-5946

Michael E. Kaemmerer

Attorney at MCCARTHY AND LEONARD LC

825 Maryville Centre Dr., Suite 300

Town And Country, MO 63017-5946

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim by AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, St. Louis Vacation Fund.(Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#9

(#9) COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs n/a Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued n/a, Consents issued n/a, non-jury demand,, filed by STF, LLC.(Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by STF, LLC.(Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant STF, LLC. Parent companies: n/a, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan M. Kaemmerer for Defendant STF, LLC. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer for Defendant STF, LLC. (Kaemmerer, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8648336, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim by AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, St. Louis Vacation Fund.(Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs n/a Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued n/a, Consents issued n/a, non-jury demand,, filed by STF, LLC.(Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by STF, LLC.(Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant STF, LLC. Parent companies: n/a, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan M. Kaemmerer for Defendant STF, LLC. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer for Defendant STF, LLC. (Kaemmerer, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 5/28/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Greg A. Campbell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JKL) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8648336, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Unions Nos. 42-110,, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where AFL-CIO is a litigant