Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2021 at 09:08:51 (UTC).

Greater St. Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Jackson Hunt, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Greater St Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Jackson Hunt, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of the Greater St.Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Laborers International Union of North America

AFL-CIO

St. Louis Vacation Fund

Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacaton Fund

Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Greater St. Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Local Union Nos. 42-110

Defendant

Jackson Hunt, LLC doing business as Hunt Environmental Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janine M. Martin

Attorney at HAMMOND AND SHINNERS PC

13205 Manchester Rd., Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

Defendant Attorney

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Suggestions in Support by Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick J. Kenny for Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St.Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacaton Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Union Nos. 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8478523, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacaton Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St.Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Text ORDER Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Suggestions in Support by Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Jackson Hunt, LLC answer due 4/23/2021. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/13/2021. (AFO) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Suggestions in Support by Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) filed by Jackson Hunt, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. (Jackson Hunt, LLC answer due 4/13/2021.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/23/2021. (JMP) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick J. Kenny for Defendant Jackson Hunt, LLC. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacaton Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St.Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. All Defendants. (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Janine M. Martin. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St.Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacaton Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Union Nos. 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8478523, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacaton Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St.Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis-Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where AFL-CIO is a litigant