This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2021 at 09:06:16 (UTC).

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Gleeson Asphalt, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Greater St Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Gleeson Asphalt, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Shirley Padmore Mensah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00576

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shirley Padmore Mensah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

AFL-CIO

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Loacal Union Nos. 42-110

Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Laborers International Union of North America

Defendant

Gleeson Asphalt, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janine M. Martin

Attorney at HAMMOND AND SHINNERS PC

13205 Manchester Rd., Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #4 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 6/21/2021. (CBL) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Loacal Union Nos. 42-110 (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Original Filing Form

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8653473, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Loacal Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Loacal Union Nos. 42-110 Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #4 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 6/21/2021. (CBL) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Loacal Union Nos. 42-110 (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (CBL) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Janine M. Martin. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8653473, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Loacal Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Loacal Union Nos. 42-110 Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gleeson Asphalt, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where AFL-CIO is a litigant