This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2020 at 09:19:46 (UTC).

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Greater St Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Christy Industrial Services Co , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew T. Schelp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01495

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew T. Schelp

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

St. Louis Vacation Fund

Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis

Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Defendant

Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janine M. Martin

Attorney at HAMMOND AND SHINNERS PC

13205 Manchester Rd., Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

Defendant Attorney

Michael D. Quinlan

Attorney at QUINLAN LAW FIRM LLC

2526 Barrett Springs Drive, Suite 100

St. Louis, MO 63021

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC. (Quinlan, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC. (Quinlan, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-8219231, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC. (Quinlan, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/09/2020. (KCD) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC. (Quinlan, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, St. Louis Vacation Fund. All Defendants. (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Janine M. Martin. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. (BAK) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Christy Industrial Services Co., LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-8219231, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO is a litigant