This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2021 at 09:08:39 (UTC).

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Build Pro STL Construction, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Greater St Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Build Pro STL Construction, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00194

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Laborers International Union of North America

AFL-CIO

Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

St. Louis Vacation Fund

Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Local Union Nos. 42-110

Defendant

Build Pro STL Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janine M. Martin

Attorney at HAMMOND AND SHINNERS PC

13205 Manchester Rd., Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/5/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Union Nos. 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Union Nos. 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8478315, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/5/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. All Defendants. (Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Union Nos. 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Campbell, Greg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Union Nos. 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 3/1/2021. (ANP) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Janine M. Martin. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Local Union Nos. 42-110, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8478315, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, AFL-CIO, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers and Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Constractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where AFL-CIO is a litigant