This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2020 at 08:49:25 (UTC).

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Buccaneer Excavating, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Greater St Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Buccaneer Excavating, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01484

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund

Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund

Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri

St. Louis Vacation Fund

Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis

Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO

Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis

Defendant

Buccaneer Excavating, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janine M. Martin

Attorney at HAMMOND AND SHINNERS PC

13205 Manchester Rd., Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment ;Proposed extension date January 11, 2021 by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The Court Orders Plaintiffs to file, no later than December 11, 2020, appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/25/2020. (CLO) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension. Plaintiffs shall file, no later than January 11, 2021, appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Courts consideration. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/10/2020. (CLO) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment ;Proposed extension date January 11, 2021 by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The Court Orders Plaintiffs to file, no later than December 11, 2020, appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/25/2020. (CLO) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, St. Louis Vacation Fund. Defendant Buccaneer Excavating LLC served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Martin, Janine) Modified on 10/22/2020 (CBL). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketJudge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CBL) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Janine M. Martin. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, St. Louis Vacation Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketReceipt 4644089963 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Jamie Buckley (CCAM) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the St. Louis Vacation Fund, Construction Laborers Pension Trust Fund of Greater St. Louis, Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Board of Trustees of the Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri, Board of Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, St. Louis Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Construction Laborers & Contractors Training Fund of Eastern Missouri is a litigant

Latest cases where Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Local Union Nos. 42-110 Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO is a litigant