This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 09:07:18 (UTC).

GREATER PENNSYLVANIA CARPENTERS PENSION FUND v. ALBER

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 GREATER PENNSYLVANIA CARPENTERS PENSION FUND filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against ALBER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa Pupo Lenihan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01216

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lisa Pupo Lenihan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREATER PENNSYLVANIA CARPENTERS PENSION FUND

Defendant

MARLIN ALBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey J. Leech

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place, 594-5524

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GREATER PENNSYLVANIA CARPENTERS PENSION FUND. MARLIN ALBER served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Leech, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/01/2020. (jmb) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to MARLIN ALBER (jmm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MARLIN ALBER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5838949), filed by GREATER PENNSYLVANIA CARPENTERS PENSION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GREATER PENNSYLVANIA CARPENTERS PENSION FUND. MARLIN ALBER served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Leech, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/01/2020. (jmb) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to MARLIN ALBER (jmm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MARLIN ALBER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5838949), filed by GREATER PENNSYLVANIA CARPENTERS PENSION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less