This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 09:27:10 (UTC).

Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C. et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00378

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C.

GMUC of Lucedale, P.C.

Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard H. Taylor

Attorney at Taylor- Martino, PC

P.O. Box 894, 51 Saint Joseph Street

Mobile, AL 36601

Steven A. Martino

Attorney at Taylor Martino, P.C.

Post Office Box 894

Mobile, AL 36601-0894

W. Lloyd Copeland

Attorney at Taylor Martino Zarzaur, P.C.

P.O. Box 894

Mobile, AL 36601

Defendant Attorney

David Hamby, Jr.

Attorney at Spear, Spear & Hamby, P.C.

169 Dauphin Street, Suite 200, Post Office Box 1347

Mobile, AL 36633

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ONLY ORDER on #17 Disclosure Statement filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/01/2020. (Lenk, Alexander) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hamby, David) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Cincinnati Casualty Company for The Cincinnati Insurance Company.. (Hamby, David) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #16 Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (mab) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by GMUC of Lucedale, P.C., Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C.. (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company; Disclosure Statement Due 9/21/2020. (tot) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Plfs are to show cause on or before 9/29/2020 why the motion should not be granted. Dft has until 10/6/2020 to file any reply it wishes to file. Motion will be taken under submission on that date without oral argument unless the Court later determines oral argument is necessary. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/2020. (tot) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Brief filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit C to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit D to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit E to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit F to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit G to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit H to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) (Hamby, David) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hamby, David) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hamby, David) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Filed by Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C., GMUC of Lucedale, P.C.. The Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020 (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #6 , #5 , #3 , #4 Disclosure Statements filed by Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C. and GMUC of Lucedale, P.C. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/4/2020. (ctn) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C.. (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C., Trio MD Realty, LLC, Semmes MD Realty, LLC, Greater Mobile Urgent Care of Springhill, LLC, Greater Mobile Urgent Care of Citronelle, LLC, Saraland MD Realty, LLC, Greater Mobile Urgent Care of Saraland, LLC, Medical Alliance Group, Rehydrate, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Trio MD Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate Semmes MD Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate Greater Mobile Urgent Care of Springhill, LLC, Other Affiliate Greater Mobile Urgent Care of Citronelle, LLC, Other Affiliate Saraland MD Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate Greater Mobile Urgent Care of Saraland, LLC, Other Affiliate Medical Alliance Group, Other Affiliate Rehydrate, LLC for Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C... (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff GMUC of Lucedale, P.C.. (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff GMUC of Lucedale, P.C.. (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by GMUC of Lucedale, P.C., Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C. for The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BALSDC-2654319, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Greater Mobile Urgent Care, P.C., GMUC of Lucedale, P.C.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Executed Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Cincinnati Policy ECP 040 93 70, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Lucedale Cincinnati Poilcy CAP 525 25 16, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Dr. Harris's Order 3.27.2020, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Dr. Harris's Latest Order 4.28.2020, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - 3.19.20 State Health Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - 4.10.2020 Governor's Order 1470, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - 4.24.2020 Governor's Order 1477, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - 4.24.20 State Health Order, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - 3.27.20 ROR to GMUC, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - 6.2.20 RHT to Adj - Response to ROR, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - 6.8.20 Claim #3526500 - Greater Mobile Denial Letter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L - 6.8.20 Claim #3562485 - GMUC Lucedale Denial Letter) (Taylor, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Hamby, Jr.(Designation Retained)