This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 09:15:10 (UTC).

Great Plains Equipment, LLC v. Fame Intelligence, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Great Plains Equipment, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fame Intelligence, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great Plains Equipment, LLC

Defendant

Fame Intelligence, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dax D Voss

Attorney at Field Manning Stone Hawthorne & Aycock

2112 Indiana Ave

Lubbock, TX 79410-1499

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory S Hudson

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77020

Christopher J Hanlon

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main Street, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Great Plains Equipment, LLC. (Voss, Dax) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer at a scheduling conference no later than 12/01/2020. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before December 15, 2020, (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 11/17/2020) (bmh) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J Hanlon on behalf of Fame Intelligence, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hanlon, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fame Intelligence, LLC. (Hudson, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#2

(#2) NEW CASE NOTES: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

1 #9

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #8

Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of interested person

1 #6

Exhibit(s) 4 - Defendant's Original Answer

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 3 - Return of Service (Citation)

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 2 - Return of Service (Citation)

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B - Docket Sheet (state court case)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by FAME INTELLIGENCE, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11278655) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Docket Sheet (state court case), #3 Exhibit(s) 1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 - Return of Service (Citation), #5 Exhibit(s) 3 - Return of Service (Citation), #6 Exhibit(s) 4 - Defendant's Original Answer, #7 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of interested person, #8 Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hudson, Gregory) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Great Plains Equipment, LLC. (Voss, Dax) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer at a scheduling conference no later than 12/01/2020. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before December 15, 2020, (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 11/17/2020) (bmh) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J Hanlon on behalf of Fame Intelligence, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hanlon, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fame Intelligence, LLC. (Hudson, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE NOTES: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by FAME INTELLIGENCE, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11278655) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Docket Sheet (state court case), #3 Exhibit(s) 1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 - Return of Service (Citation), #5 Exhibit(s) 3 - Return of Service (Citation), #6 Exhibit(s) 4 - Defendant's Original Answer, #7 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of interested person, #8 Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hudson, Gregory) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less