This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2020 at 08:56:53 (UTC).

Great Northern Insurance Company v. Denver Water

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 Great Northern Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Denver Water. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01130

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great Northern Insurance Company

Defendant

Denver Water

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geri Ann O'Brian Williams

Attorney at Dworkin Chambers Williams York Benson & Evans, PC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 1300

Denver, CO 80210

Defendant Attorneys

Gillian Dale

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Tatiana G. Popacondria

Attorney at Tatiana G. Popacondria, Attorney at Law

6784 East Long Avenue

Centennial, CO 80112

Andrew James Hill

Attorney at Denver Water Department

1600 West 12Th Avenue

Denver, CO 80204

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Denver Water All parties consent.. (Popacondria, Tatiana) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gillian Dale on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Gillian Dale added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Dale, Gillian) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/1/2020. At the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference currently set on June 22, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to July 29, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (apesa, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Denver Water waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Lorden, Emilie) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tatiana G. Popacondria on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Tatiana G. Popacondria added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Popacondria, Tatiana) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew James Hill on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Andrew James Hill added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Hill, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/23/2020. Consent Form due by 6/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Denver Water re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Company. (O'Brian Williams, Geri) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7262569)Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Denver Water(pty:dft), filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brian Williams, Geri) Modified on 4/22/2020 to correct docket entry (trvo, ). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/8/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Denver Water All parties consent.. (Popacondria, Tatiana) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gillian Dale on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Gillian Dale added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Dale, Gillian) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/1/2020. At the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference currently set on June 22, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to July 29, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (apesa, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Denver Water waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Lorden, Emilie) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tatiana G. Popacondria on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Tatiana G. Popacondria added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Popacondria, Tatiana) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew James Hill on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Andrew James Hill added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Hill, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/23/2020. Consent Form due by 6/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Denver Water re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Company. (O'Brian Williams, Geri) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7262569)Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Denver Water(pty:dft), filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brian Williams, Geri) Modified on 4/22/2020 to correct docket entry (trvo, ). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less