This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 07:28:59 (UTC).

Great Northern Insurance Company v. Cohen

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 a Property - Other Personal Property case was filed by Great Northern Insurance Company against Cohen in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08700

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies

Great Northern Insurance Company

Defendant

David Cohen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tamar Schwartz Wise

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor (Broadway)

45 Broadway Atrium, Suite 1600

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against David Cohen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17626923)Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies.(Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/20/2019) (ne) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Cohen. (jgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company for Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies.(Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Cohen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. David Cohen served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Service was accepted by David Cohen. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. David Cohen served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Service was accepted by David Cohen. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/20/2019) (ne) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Cohen. (jgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tamar Schwartz Wise. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Great Northern Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tamar Schwartz Wise. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Cohen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company for Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies.(Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against David Cohen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17626923)Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies.(Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less