This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2020 at 08:47:26 (UTC).

Great Host International, Inc. d/b/a Andalucia Nuts v. Johnvince Foods

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Great Host International, Inc d/b/a Andalucia Nuts filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Johnvince Foods. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ewing Werlein, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03511

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great Host International, Inc. d/b/a Andalucia Nuts

Defendant

Johnvince Foods

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haroon Abdallah Rafati

Attorney at The Rafati Law Firm, PLLC

7106 Glen Rosa Dr

Katy, TX 77494

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Johnvince Foods served on 10/15/2020, answer due 1/13/2021, filed.(Rafati, Haroon) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 02:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Johnvince Foods. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Johnvince Foods, filed.(Rafati, Haroon) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Canada Suit

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand and Invoices

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - New Customer Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnvince Foods (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25348499) filed by Great Host International, Inc. d/b/a Andalucia Nuts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - New Customer Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand and Invoices, #4 Exhibit Canada Suit)(Rafati, Haroon) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Johnvince Foods served on 10/15/2020, answer due 1/13/2021, filed.(Rafati, Haroon) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 02:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Johnvince Foods. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Johnvince Foods, filed.(Rafati, Haroon) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnvince Foods (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25348499) filed by Great Host International, Inc. d/b/a Andalucia Nuts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - New Customer Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand and Invoices, #4 Exhibit Canada Suit)(Rafati, Haroon) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less