This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 10:30:28 (UTC).

Great Bowery v. Tamara Berkovich et al.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Great Bowery filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tamara Berkovich. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Josephine L. Staton and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01687

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE

Great Bowery doing business as Trunk Archive

Defendants

TAMARA BERKOVICH d/b/a TAMARA DAY SPA BEVERLY HILLS

Does 1 through 10 inclusive,

Tamara Berkovich doing business as Tamara Day Spa Beverly Hills

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Hany Gonzalez

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By More Than 30 days (Doc. #16 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: (1) Defendants' responsive pleading or motion to dismiss the Complaint, previously due on April 13, 2022, is hereby reset to May 28, 2022. (jp) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/13/2022 re Complaint #1 #13 by Clerk. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by Friday, April 29, 2022. (lom) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint #1 #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). (2) The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. (3) All parties MUST be signed on the stipulation and/or motion who have appear on the case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Bowery, upon Defendant Tamara Berkovich served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE - REFUSED NAME - EMPLOYEE in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tamara Berkovich. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. Adding Hany Gonzalez as counsel of record for GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE, (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By More Than 30 days (Doc. #16 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: (1) Defendants' responsive pleading or motion to dismiss the Complaint, previously due on April 13, 2022, is hereby reset to May 28, 2022. (jp) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/28/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Great Bowery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/13/2022 re Complaint #1 #13 by Clerk. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by Friday, April 29, 2022. (lom) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint #1 #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). (2) The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. (3) All parties MUST be signed on the stipulation and/or motion who have appear on the case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 15 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/13/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Great Bowery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Higbee, Mathew) Modified on 4/25/2022 (lom). (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Bowery, upon Defendant Tamara Berkovich served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE - REFUSED NAME - EMPLOYEE in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tamara Berkovich. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. Adding Hany Gonzalez as counsel of record for GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE, (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32944082 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew K Higbee