This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2022 at 09:30:12 (UTC).

Great Bowery, Inc. v. Karyng, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 Great Bowery, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Karyng, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03599

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE

Great Bowery, Inc. doing business as Trunk Archive

Defendants

KARYNG, LLC

KARYN GROSSMAN

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Ryan E Carreon

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorney

Alan Jay Gordee

Attorney at Gordee Nowicki and Blakeney LLP

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 870

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/18/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Karyn Grossman, Karyng, LLC, identifying Karyn L. Grossman, M.D., Inc.. (Gordee, Alan) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendants Karyn Grossman, Karyng, LLC.(Attorney Alan Jay Gordee added to party Karyn Grossman(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Jay Gordee added to party Karyng, LLC(pty:dft))(Gordee, Alan) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Karyn Grossman, Karyng, LLC #15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. The proofs of service must be made clear that the person served is authorized to accept service. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (iv) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

15 #2

Proposed Entry of Default

15 #1

Declaration of Ryan E. Carreon

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Bowery, Inc., upon Defendant Karyn Grossman served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraina Prado, Front Desk Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Bowery, Inc., upon Defendant Karyng, LLC served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraina Prado, Front Desk Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Karyn Grossman. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Karyng, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

1 #3

Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits A-C

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/18/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Karyn Grossman, Karyng, LLC, identifying Karyn L. Grossman, M.D., Inc.. (Gordee, Alan) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendants Karyn Grossman, Karyng, LLC.(Attorney Alan Jay Gordee added to party Karyn Grossman(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Jay Gordee added to party Karyng, LLC(pty:dft))(Gordee, Alan) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Karyn Grossman, Karyng, LLC #15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. The proofs of service must be made clear that the person served is authorized to accept service. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (iv) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Karyn Grossman, Karyng, LLC filed by Plaintiff Great Bowery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan E. Carreon, #2 Proposed Entry of Default) (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Bowery, Inc., upon Defendant Karyn Grossman served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraina Prado, Front Desk Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Bowery, Inc., upon Defendant Karyng, LLC served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraina Prado, Front Desk Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Karyn Grossman. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Karyng, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Great Bowery, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE, (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33364860 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party GREAT BOWERY, INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Bowery Inc is a litigant