This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2023 at 16:54:17 (UTC).

Great American Insurance Company v. Salem Group, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Great American Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Salem Group, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01609

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great American Insurance Company

Defendants

Selwan Construction, Inc.

Naser Salem

Matilda Sleiman

Salem Group, Inc. doing business as Complete Concrete

Matilda Suleiman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Morris Fitzgerald

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1219 Fm 314

Van, TX 75790

Defendant Attorney

Carl William Thompson

Attorney at The Law Office of Carl Thompson, PC

10900 Brittmoore Park Dr, Ste L

Houston, TX 77041

 

Court Documents

19 #13

Proposed Order

19 #12

Exhibit 11 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #11

Exhibit 10 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #10

Exhibit 9 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #9

Exhibit 8 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #8

Exhibit 7 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #7

Exhibit 6 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #6

Exhibit 5 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #5

Exhibit 4 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #4

Exhibit 3 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #3

Exhibit 2 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #2

Exhibit 1 to Dierkers Affidavit

19 #1

Affidavit Ex. A - Dierkers Affidavit

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#17

(#17) DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Great American Insurance Company, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 1-2 days. Bench. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 9/30/2022. Pltf Expert Report due by 9/30/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 11/1/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 11/1/2022. Discovery due by 2/1/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/10/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/10/2023. Responses due by 3/3/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen Jury Trial set for 9/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Great American Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2022. (Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Great American Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Dierkers Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 to Dierkers Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 to Dierkers Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 to Dierkers Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 4 to Dierkers Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5 to Dierkers Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 6 to Dierkers Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 7 to Dierkers Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 8 to Dierkers Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 9 to Dierkers Affidavit, #11 Exhibit 10 to Dierkers Affidavit, #12 Exhibit 11 to Dierkers Affidavit, #13 Proposed Order)(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Great American Insurance Company, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 1-2 days. Bench. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 9/30/2022. Pltf Expert Report due by 9/30/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 11/1/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 11/1/2022. Discovery due by 2/1/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/10/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/10/2023. Responses due by 3/3/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen Jury Trial set for 9/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: The Court conducted the Initial Conference and entered a Scheduling Order. Appearances: Robert Morris Fitzgerald, Carl William Thompson. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 10:02-10:03AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/14/2022) (sjones, 4). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Great American Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Resetting re: #5 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/14/2022 at 10:10 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Naser Salem, Salem Group, Inc., Selwan Construction, Inc., Matilda Sleiman, filed.(Thompson, Carl) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Great American Insurance Company, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of Service, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Matilda Sleiman served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Naser Salem served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Selwan Construction, Inc. served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Salem Group, Inc. served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 10:10 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Naser Salem, Salem Group, Inc. d/b/a Complete Concrete, Selwan Construction, Inc., Matilda Sleiman. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Great American Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2022. (Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Additional summons, #2 Additional summons, #3 Additional summons)(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28205740) filed by Great American Insurance Company.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less