This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2023 at 07:18:20 (UTC).

Great American Insurance Company v. Mosher

Case Summary

On 02/13/2023 Great American Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Mosher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-04022

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great American Insurance Company

Defendant

Bradley Mosher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick Q. Hustead

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan A. Heber

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3969539, in shell case on 2/13/23 filed by Great American Insurance Company on 2/13/23. (SKK) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Bradley Mosher. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company. (Hustead, Patrick) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Bradley Mosher served on 03/06/23. (Hustead, Patrick) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bradley Mosher. (Heber, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#6

(#6) CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement by Bradley Mosher. (Heber, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/24/2023 (DJP). (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/27/23. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(SKK) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

7 #1

Letter to counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/27/23. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(SKK) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement by Bradley Mosher. (Heber, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/24/2023 (DJP). (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bradley Mosher. (Heber, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Bradley Mosher served on 03/06/23. (Hustead, Patrick) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company. (Hustead, Patrick) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Bradley Mosher. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3969539, in shell case on 2/13/23 filed by Great American Insurance Company on 2/13/23. (SKK) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less