This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2022 at 08:04:48 (UTC).

Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Great American Insurance Company of New York filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Evergreen Shipping Agency America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00817

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great American Insurance Company of New York

Defendants

Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation

Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua E. Kirsch

Attorney at Gibson Robb & Lindh LLP

1255 Powell Street

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant Attorney

Alan Nakazawa

Attorney at Collier Walsh Nakazawa LLP

One World Trade Center, Suite 2370

Long Beach, CA 90831

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying Other Affiliate Paramount Export Company for Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company for Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Great American Insurance Company of New York.. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION WITHOUT PROPOSED ORDER FOR Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. (Nakazawa, Alan) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (klh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#13

(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation.. (Nakazawa, Alan) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

15 #15

Main Document

15 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2022. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/17/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint byEvergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. (Nakazawa, Alan) (Filed on 4/4/2022) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Interested Entities by Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation, Corporate Parent Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Other Affiliate Gard P&I Club for Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. re #17 Answer to Complaint (Nakazawa, Alan) (Filed on 4/4/2022) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint byEvergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. (Nakazawa, Alan) (Filed on 4/4/2022) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2022. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/17/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation.. (Nakazawa, Alan) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Evergreen Shipping Agency shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/16/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation Correct Event : Stipulation to Extend Time. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION WITHOUT PROPOSED ORDER FOR Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. (Nakazawa, Alan) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (klh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd, Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Great American Insurance Company of New York.. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company for Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying Other Affiliate Paramount Export Company for Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damage to Cargo against Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation, Evergreen Marine (Hong Kong) Ltd. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16883117.). Filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2022) Modified on 2/9/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERGREEN SHIPPING AGENCY (AMERICA) CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Evergreen Marine (UK) Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Nakazawa