This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 07:11:04 (UTC).

Great American Assurance Company et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 Great American Assurance Company filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Boy Scouts of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01244

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellants

Great American Assurance Company

Great American E&S Insurance Company

Agricultural Insurance Company

Agricultural Excess and Surplus Insurance Company

Debtor

Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC

Appellees

Boy Scouts of America

Delaware BSA, LLC

Tort Claimants' Committee

Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice

Future Claimants' Representative

The Zalkin Law Firm, P.C.

Pfau Cochran Vertetis Amala PLLC

Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

First State Insurance Company

Twin City Fire Insurance Company

Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

American Zurich Insurance Company

American Guarantee Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

Clarendon National Insurance Company

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Bruce W. McCullough

Bruce D. Celebrezze

Konrad R. Krebs

Appellee Attorneys

Derek C. Abbott

Tori Lynn Remington

Andrew R. Remming

Paige Noelle Topper

James E. O'Neill, III

Rachel B. Mersky

Robert Steven Brady

Edwin J. Harron

Kenneth John Enos

Kevin A. Guerke

David M. Klauder

Thomas E. Patterson

Erin R. Fay

Gregory Joseph Flasser

Robert D. Cecil, Jr.

Matthew Gernet Summers

Other Attorneys

Kurt F. Gwynne

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint Designation of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC.(Remington, Tori) Modified on 10/7/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod - filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel B. Mersky on behalf of Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald (Rex) Frederick Brien, Jr. - filed by Great American Assurance Company, Great American E&S Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#10

SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#4

SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Christian, filed by Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, and #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Konrad R. Krebs, filed by Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2022. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

#22

(#17) ORDER Granting Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeal From Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

21 #1

Exhibit 1

21 #13

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (srs) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

1 #4

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #3

Exhibit A to Order on Appeal

1 #2

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Opinion on Appeal

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Granting Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeal From Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED Order re Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeals from Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC (D.I. #3 ), by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC, Delaware BSA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 10/17/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Conference to discuss consolidation structure and an overall briefing schedule held on 10/7/2022. Counsel for Appellants: K. Miller, D. Richards, L. Rizzo, T. Weaver. M. Sawczuk, R. K. Hill, D. Fournier, M. Joyce, C. Brown, B. Sullivan, S. Ennis. Counsel for Appellees: D. Abbott, J. O'Neill, R. Brady, R. Mersky, M. Summers, S. Stamoulis, M. Eckard. The parties are to resubmit the motion with the agreed-to changes in terms of consolidation. The parties are also directed to reach out to Chambers once the answering briefs are filed. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA et al. (lah) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint Designation of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC.(Remington, Tori) Modified on 10/7/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod, filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod - filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel B. Mersky on behalf of Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald (Rex) Frederick Brien, Jr., filed by Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald (Rex) Frederick Brien, Jr. - filed by Great American Assurance Company, Great American E&S Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Christian, filed by Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, and #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Konrad R. Krebs, filed by Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2022. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motion filed at D.I. 6 on 9/28/2022, has been removed from the docket. The filing contained errors in the caption. First, it referenced cases that the filing party is not a member to. Second, incorrect initials were used after the case number. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Christian - filed by Great American Assurance Company, Great American E&S Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Konrad R. Krebs - filed by Great American Assurance Company, Great American E&S Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA through 1:22-cv-01247-RGA; 1:22-cv-01249-RGA through 1:22-cv-01252-RGA, 1:22-cv-01254-RGA, 1:22-cv-01258-RGA and 1:22-cv-01263-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JOINT Motion for Consolidation and to Approve Stipulation Regarding Appeals from Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC - filed by Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 9/28/2022 (nms). (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (srs) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (srs) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (srs) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Opinion entered on 07/29/2022 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein and Order entered on 09/08/2022 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343(LSS). Fee Status Paid.- filed by Great American Assurance Company, Great American E&S Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Opinion on Appeal, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Exhibit A to Order on Appeal, #4 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(srs) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less