This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2021 at 11:20:14 (UTC).

Grayson L L C (of Louisiana) et al v. B P X Operating Co et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Grayson L L C of Louisiana filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against B P X Operating Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and Elizabeth E Foote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grayson L.L.C. (of Louisiana)

Anderson Exploration Energy Company, L.C.

Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C

Grayson L L C of Louisiana

Defendants

BPX Production Company

BPX Operating Company

B P X Operating Co

B P X Production Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Larry Shea, Jr

Attorney at Bradley Murchison et al

401 Edwards St Ste 1000

Shreveport, LA 71101-5529

Ashley Gill Gable

Attorney at Bradley Murchison et al

401 Edwards St Ste 1000

Shreveport, LA 71101-5529

Leland G Horton

Attorney at Bradley Murchison et al

401 Edwards St Ste 1000

Shreveport, LA 71101-5529

Defendant Attorneys

Gus Edward Laggner

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

Brittan Jackson Bush

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

April Leigh Rolen-Ogden

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

Michael Herold Ishee

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. (aty,Laggner, Gus) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

16 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Amended and Restated Petition

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C, Grayson L L C of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Amended and Restated Petition)(aty,Gable, Ashley) Modified on 2/22/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Memo in Support

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement by B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Laggner, Gus) Modified on 2/2/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM ORDER. The court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/26/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#12

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal Attached Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/25/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co identifying Other Affiliate BPX Energy, Inc., Other Affiliate BP plc for B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. (aty,Laggner, Gus) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

9 #3

*Restricted*

9 #2

Proposed order

9 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#9

(#9) MOTION to Seal Attached Document - Statement of Citizenship and Domicile by Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C, Grayson L L C of Louisiana. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Sealed Statement of Citizenship and Domicile)(aty,Gable, Ashley) Modified on 1/22/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C, Grayson L L C of Louisiana. (aty,Gable, Ashley) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

6 #2

Local Rule 7.9 Certificate

6 #1

Proposed order

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. (aty,Laggner, Gus) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C, Grayson L L C of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Amended and Restated Petition)(aty,Gable, Ashley) Modified on 2/22/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement by B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Laggner, Gus) Modified on 2/2/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM ORDER. The court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/26/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SEALED DOCUMENT: Plaintiffs' Statement of Citizenship and Domicile by Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C, Grayson L L C of Louisiana. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal Attached Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/25/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co identifying Other Affiliate BPX Energy, Inc., Other Affiliate BP plc for B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. (aty,Laggner, Gus) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Seal Attached Document - Statement of Citizenship and Domicile by Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C, Grayson L L C of Louisiana. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Sealed Statement of Citizenship and Domicile)(aty,Gable, Ashley) Modified on 1/22/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anderson Exploration Energy Co L C, Grayson L L C of Louisiana. (aty,Gable, Ashley) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer B P X Operating Co answer due 2/1/2021; B P X Production Co answer due 2/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/19/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Local Rule 7.9 Certificate)(aty,Laggner, Gus) Modified on 1/15/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/12/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM ORDER. The deadline for filing the amended notice of removal is January 29, 2021. The court will review the filing and determine whether there is a basis for subject matter jurisdiction. See Memorandum Order for details. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/12/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/8/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to April Leigh Rolen-Ogden, Brittan Jackson Bush, Michael Herold Ishee, Gus Edward Laggner on behalf of B P X Operating Co, B P X Production Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. BPX Operating Company answer due 1/15/2021; BPX Production Company answer due 1/15/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 TO DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 627,364-C (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4527678) filed by B P X Production Co, B P X Operating Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Certified Copy of State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Notice, #4 Notice of Filing and Certificate of Removing Defendant, #5 Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #6 Roster of Attorneys, #7 Notice of Removal to COC for State Court Action)(Attorney Gus Edward Laggner added to party B P X Operating Co and B P X Production Co(pty:dft))(aty,Laggner, Gus) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BPX Operating Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYSON O. COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Larry Shea, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leland G. Horton