This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:54:11 (UTC).

Grayson et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Grayson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne T. Berton and David C Guaderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00216

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anne T. Berton

Presiding Judge

David C Guaderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Maria Luisa Grayson

Bennie Grayson

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Robert C. Lane

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

6200 Savoy, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77036

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Kent M. Hanszen

Attorney at Hanzsen LaPorte, LLP

11767 Katy Freeway, Ste 850

Houston, TX 77079

Matthew Slade Crandall Hansel

Attorney at Hanszen Laporte LLP

14201 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77079

Anthony L. Laporte

Attorney at Hanszen Laporte, LLP

14201 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77079

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2021 02:00 PM before Judge David C Guaderrama, Jury Trial set for 10/11/2021 09:00 AM before Judge David C Guaderrama, ADR Report Deadline due by 8/1/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2020, Discovery due by 4/7/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2021. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER for Parties to RETAIN local counsel no later than October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mc4) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mc4). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Bennie Grayson, Maria Luisa Grayson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before SEPTEMBER 9, 2020, why they have not complied with the Courts August 3, 2020, Order for Proposed Scheduling Order and Joint Report.Show Cause Response due to the Court by 9/9/2020. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (em) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Original Petition , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT REPORT TO BE SUBMITTED BY 9/2/20 . Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (lc3) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 8/24/2020,. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (jg1) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

2 #2

Supplement

2 #1

Supplement

#2

(#2) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13794108), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2021 02:00 PM before Judge David C Guaderrama, Jury Trial set for 10/11/2021 09:00 AM before Judge David C Guaderrama, ADR Report Deadline due by 8/1/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2020, Discovery due by 4/7/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2021. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER for Parties to RETAIN local counsel no later than October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mc4) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mc4). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Bennie Grayson, Maria Luisa Grayson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before SEPTEMBER 9, 2020, why they have not complied with the Courts August 3, 2020, Order for Proposed Scheduling Order and Joint Report.Show Cause Response due to the Court by 9/9/2020. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (em) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Anne T. Berton. (mt) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. Judge Anne T. Berton no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Original Petition , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2020, (mt) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT REPORT TO BE SUBMITTED BY 9/2/20 . Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (lc3) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 8/24/2020,. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (jg1) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Anne T. Berton. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13794108), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laporte, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less