This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:39:26 (UTC).

Graydon v. Unknown

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Graydon filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Unknown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00847

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Graydon

Jackson, LA 70748

Defendant

Unknown

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Filing Fee due by 1/17/2020. Statement of Account due by 1/17/2020. (SWE) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#4

(#4) JUDGMENT: The above captioned proceeding is Dismissed without prejudice for failure of the Plaintiff to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/31/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Unknown, filed by John Graydon.(KMW) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) RULING: Plaintiff's action shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/31/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JUDGMENT: The above captioned proceeding is Dismissed without prejudice for failure of the Plaintiff to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/31/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULING: Plaintiff's action shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/31/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Filing Fee due by 1/17/2020. Statement of Account due by 1/17/2020. (SWE) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Unknown, filed by John Graydon.(KMW) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.