This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2019 at 07:58:06 (UTC).

Gray v. Lee et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Gray filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly E. West

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tina Dianne Gray

Dianne Gray

Defendants

Marcus Lavon Lee

Juan M. Gutierrez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Warren Gotcher

Attorney at Gotcher and Beaver

Po Box 160

Mcalester, OK 74502

Paul Warren Gotcher

Attorney at Gotcher and Beaver

Po Box 160

Mcalester, OK 74502

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholaus A. Hancock

Attorney at Coffey Senger & McDaniel, PLLC

4725 E 91St St, Ste 100

Tulsa, OK 74137

Robert P. Coffey, Jr.

Attorney at Coffey Senger & McDaniel, PLLC

4725 E 91St St, Ste 100

Tulsa, OK 74137

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #8

Exhibit 8 - Letter dated 8/5/19

2 #7

Exhibit 7 - Initial disclosures

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - Answer - Gutierrez

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance - Coffey

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Return of Service - Gutierrez

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summonses

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#2

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and hearings set before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West are hereby stricken. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 19-268-RAW.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - This Court acknowledges the random assignment of this case. By separate electronic mail transmission from the Clerk of this Court, the parties have been provided the Notice of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge With Consent to Proceed or District Judge Option form for completion and submission. If you have not received a copy of the Notice from the Clerk, a copy may be obtained on this District's website at www.oked.uscourts.gov under the tab for Forms and is titled Consent or District Judge Option Form. The parties shall submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form by SEPTEMBER 23, 2019.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 9/26/2019 at 10:15 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Warren Gotcher on behalf of Tina Dianne Gray (Gotcher, Warren) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Marcus Lavon Lee (Hancock, Nicholaus) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JURY DEMAND by Juan M. Gutierrez, Marcus Lavon Lee (Hancock, Nicholaus) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholaus A. Hancock on behalf of Juan M. Gutierrez, Marcus Lavon Lee (Hancock, Nicholaus) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert P. Coffey, Jr on behalf of Juan M. Gutierrez, Marcus Lavon Lee (Coffey, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/15/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1290127 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Marcus Lavon Lee (Hancock, Nicholaus) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 8/21/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Atoka County District Court, case number 18-CJ-49 by Marcus Lavon Lee (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marcus Lavon Lee (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketPETITION filed in State Court against Juan M. Gutierrez, Marcus Lavon Lee by Tina Dianne Gray (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P Coffey, Jr