This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 07:32:54 (UTC).

Gray et al v. Price et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Gray filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Price. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and David M. Lawson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10383

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Presiding Judge

David M. Lawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Theoddeus R. Gray

Theoddeus Gray

Defendants

Officer Tom Price

Officer James Ziemiecki

Officer Trevor Head

City of St. Clair Shores

Officer Jessie Smith

Officer Travis Kaufman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Attilio V. Colella

Attorney at Moss and Colella

28411 Northwestern Highway, Suite 1150

Southfield, MI 48034

Victor Balta

Attorney at Moss & Colella P.C.

28411 Northwestern Hwy., Suite1150

Southfield, MI 48034

Steven F. Fishman

615 Griswold, Suite 1125

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorney

Timothy S. Ferrand

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey,

19176 Hall Road, Suite 220

Clinton Township, MI 48038

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to #12 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by All Plaintiffs. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Ferrand, Timothy) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Ferrand on behalf of All Defendants. (Ferrand, Timothy) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven F. Fishman appearing on behalf of Theoddeus Gray (Fishman, Steven) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor Balta appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Balta, Victor) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of St. Clair Shores served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jessie Smith served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Ziemiecki served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trevor Head served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Travis Kaufman served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Tom Price served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7097987 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 5/1/2019 at 3:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to #12 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by All Plaintiffs. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Ferrand, Timothy) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Ferrand on behalf of All Defendants. (Ferrand, Timothy) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven F. Fishman appearing on behalf of Theoddeus Gray (Fishman, Steven) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor Balta appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Balta, Victor) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of St. Clair Shores served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jessie Smith served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Ziemiecki served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trevor Head served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Travis Kaufman served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Tom Price served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7097987 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Colella, Attilio) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven F. Fishman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victor Balta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Attilio V. Colella