This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 09:09:04 (UTC).

Gray et al v. Home Depot U S A Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Gray filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03717

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ralph Gray

Marsha Gray

Defendants

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Sedwick Claims Management Services, Inc.

Home Depot U S A Inc

Sedwick Claims Management Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Meghan Marie Nolen

Attorney at Morris Dewett & Savoie

509 Milam St

Shreveport, LA 71101

Brandon Trey Morris

Attorney at Morris Dewett & Savoie

509 Milam St

Shreveport, LA 71101

Elizabeth Ann Hancock

Attorney at Morris Dewett & Savoie

509 Milam St

Shreveport, LA 71101

John Allen Davis

Attorney at Morris Dewett & Savoie

509 Milam St

Shreveport, LA 71101

Joshua Lynn Powell

Attorney at Morris Dewett & Savoie

509 Milam St

Shreveport, LA 71101

Justin Carey Dewett

Attorney at Morris Dewett & Savoie

509 Milam St

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorneys

Megan Sara Peterson

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Milton Davis Ready

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Home Depot U S A Inc, Marsha Gray and Ralph Gray . (aty,Peterson, Megan) Modified to add filers on 12/13/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 11:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 12/23/2021. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/30/2021. Rule 26 Report due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/6/2021. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Trey Morris, Justin Carey Dewett, Elizabeth Ann Hancock, John Allen Davis, Joshua Lynn Powell for Marsha Gray and Ralph Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/24/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

11 #1

Proposed order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Trey Morris, Justin C. Dewett, Elizabeth A. Hancock, John A. Davis and Josh L. Powell to Enroll as Counsel by Ralph Gray. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Nolen, Meghan) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 10/26/2021. (crt,McDonnell, D) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#9

(#9) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/25/2021. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

8 #1

Proposed order

#8

(#8) Joint JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Sedwick Claims Management Services Inc, Ralph Gray and Marsha Gray. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Peterson, Megan) Modified filers on 10/25/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot International, Inc. for Home Depot U S A Inc. (aty,Peterson, Megan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U S A Inc.(aty,Peterson, Megan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/22/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Megan Sara Peterson on behalf of Home Depot U S A Inc, Sedwick Claims Management Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/5/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

1 #7

Civil cover sheet

1 #5

Exhibit D - 6/21/21 Spine Institute Record

1 #4

Exhibit C - 5/10/21 Spine Institute Record

1 #2

Exhibit A-1 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Counsel

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Home Depot U S A Inc, Marsha Gray and Ralph Gray . (aty,Peterson, Megan) Modified to add filers on 12/13/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 11:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 12/23/2021. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/30/2021. Rule 26 Report due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/6/2021. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/6/2021. (jud,McClusky, Kayla) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Trey Morris, Justin Carey Dewett, Elizabeth Ann Hancock, John Allen Davis, Joshua Lynn Powell for Marsha Gray and Ralph Gray. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/24/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Trey Morris, Justin C. Dewett, Elizabeth A. Hancock, John A. Davis and Josh L. Powell to Enroll as Counsel by Ralph Gray. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Nolen, Meghan) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 10/26/2021. (crt,McDonnell, D) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/25/2021. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Sedwick Claims Management Services Inc, Ralph Gray and Marsha Gray. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Peterson, Megan) Modified filers on 10/25/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot International, Inc. for Home Depot U S A Inc. (aty,Peterson, Megan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U S A Inc.(aty,Peterson, Megan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/22/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Megan Sara Peterson on behalf of Home Depot U S A Inc, Sedwick Claims Management Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/5/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Home Depot U S A Inc in the 1st JDC, Parish of Caddo. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Removal to State Court by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Sedwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (aty,Peterson, Megan) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal to Plaintiff by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Sedwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (aty,Peterson, Megan) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 631-633 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4865374) filed by Sedwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Petition, #3 Exhibit B - 9/24/21 Email, #4 Exhibit C - 5/10/21 Spine Institute Record, #5 Exhibit D - 6/21/21 Spine Institute Record, #6 Exhibit E - PL's Medical Bill Summary, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Megan Sara Peterson added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Megan Sara Peterson added to party Sedwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Peterson, Megan) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Sara Peterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Milton Davis Ready