This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 09:27:14 (UTC).

Gray et al v. Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Gray filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Crum Forster Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03694

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Spot Lounge & Bar

Aaron Gray

Defendants

Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company

Cage Insurance & Financial Services

Darrell Cage

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashton Levar Taylor

Attorney at Ashton Taylor Law Firm

Shakespeare Suite 5

Houston, TX 77030

Defendant Attorneys

Daisy Khambatta

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLP

3821 Juniper Trace, Suite 101

Austin, TX 78738

Daniel Pickett

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLP

120 Mountain View Boulevard

Basking Ridge, NY 07920

Kristin V. Gallagher

Attorney at Caroll McNulty & Kull L.L.C

P O Box 650

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER - Granting #11 Joint MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. ORDERED, that the Defendant Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, only, is hereby dismissed without prejudice and that this cause be remanded to the 269th Judicial Court, Harris County, Texas, against all remaining Defendants...*** Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company terminated..*** Attorney Daisy Khambatta terminated..*** Case terminated on 12/2/20. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 11/23/2020 re: #6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference (Plaintiffs will voluntarily dismiss the case by close of business on 11/24/2020). Appearances: Daisy Khambatta, Ashton Levar Taylor.(Court Reporter: F. Warner)(Tape #10:46-10:53), filed.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Setting re: #6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:45 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (gclairadi, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Daniel Pickett to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Daniel Pickett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2020. (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2020. (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company identifying United States Fire Insurance Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 12/3/20 by Fed Ex re: 13 Document(s) Sent, filed. (rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER - Granting #11 Joint MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. ORDERED, that the Defendant Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, only, is hereby dismissed without prejudice and that this cause be remanded to the 269th Judicial Court, Harris County, Texas, against all remaining Defendants...*** Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company terminated..*** Attorney Daisy Khambatta terminated..*** Case terminated on 12/2/20. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 11/23/2020 re: #6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference (Plaintiffs will voluntarily dismiss the case by close of business on 11/24/2020). Appearances: Daisy Khambatta, Ashton Levar Taylor.(Court Reporter: F. Warner)(Tape #10:46-10:53), filed.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Setting re: #6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:45 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (gclairadi, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Daniel Pickett to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Daniel Pickett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2020. (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2020. (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company identifying United States Fire Insurance Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th, Harris County, case number 2020-44144 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25422437) filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daisy Khambatta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Pickett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin V. Gallagher