This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2020 at 07:45:25 (UTC).

Gray et al v. City of Denham Springs et al

Case Summary

On 12/24/2019 Gray filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against City of Denham Springs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin Wilder-Doomes and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00889

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Issac Gray

Jacob Gray

Robert Gray

Defendants

City of Denham Springs

City of Denham Springs Police Department

J Shannon Womack

Unknown Denham Springs Police Officers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald S. Haley, Jr.

8211 Goodwood Blvd, Suite E

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Lance Covington Unglesby

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Adrian Michael Simm, Jr

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Christopher James Murell

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

607 St. Charles Ave, Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dedrick Arvell Moore

Attorney at Dedrick A. Moore & Assoc.

4962 Florida Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Attachment Civil Coversheet

1 #2

Attachment Summons

1 #3

Attachment Summons

#2

#3

#5

5 #1

Attachment IFP Long Form

#7

#10

10 #1

summons

10 #2

summons

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/18/2020. (BLR) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to City of Denham Springs, Unknown Denham Springs Police Officers, J Shannon Womack. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(EDC) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel: In light of the #7 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis long form filed, the show cause hearing set for 2/10/2020 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Second MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis long form. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis long form by Robert Gray. (Haley, Ronald) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing before the Magistrate Judge set for 2/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes for plaintiff Robert Gray's failure to comply with the court's #5 Order. In lieu of appearing at the hearing plaintiff Robert Grey shall file an AO 239 form by 2/4/2020. The #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Gray is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: as to #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff, Robert Gray, shall complete and submit the attached form, AO 239 - Application To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) to the Court by 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment IFP Long Form)(LLH) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Jacob Gray, only. The Clerk shall file said complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Jacob Gray without prepayment of costs or security thereof and shall NOT issue summons until directed to do so by the court. The U.S. Marshall shall NOT serve the defendant until directed to do so by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis , #3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacob Gray. (LT) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Gray. (Haley, Ronald) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/2/2020 and edit text) (LT). (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Denham Springs, City of Denham Springs Police Department, J Shannon Womack, filed by Robert Issac Gray, Jacob Gray. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Coversheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons)(Haley, Ronald) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Covington Unglesby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dedrick Arvell Moore